NJ S2155 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4020
Note: Carry Over of previous A5226
Note: Carry Over of previous A5226
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Pending: Senate Higher Eduction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits sports wagering partnerships at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Prohibits sports wagering partnerships at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4020 (Carry Over) 2023-06-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A5226 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4113 (Same As) 2025-03-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A5226 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A4113 (Same As) 2025-03-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2155 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2155_I1.HTM |