NJ S2109 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A635
Note: Carry Foward to future S1852
Note: Carry Over of previous S1199
Note: Carry Over of previous A2011
Note: Carry Foward to future S1852
Note: Carry Over of previous S1199
Note: Carry Over of previous A2011
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipalities to hold certain inactive liquor licenses reserved for smart growth developments for an additional five years.
Title
Permits municipalities to hold certain inactive liquor licenses reserved for smart growth developments for an additional five years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2109 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2109 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1128 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S1199 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2011 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2109 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1128 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
S1199 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2011 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2109 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2109_I1.HTM |