NJ S2108 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2340 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Substituted by A2340 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes students in Marie H. Katzenbach school for the deaf to operate State vehicle for driver education and provides protection for such activity under tort claims act.*
Title
Authorizes students in Marie H. Katzenbach school for the deaf to operate State vehicle for driver education and provides protection for such activity under tort claims act.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Senate | Substituted by A2340 (1R) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (27-0) (Greenstein) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2340 (Same As) 2017-05-11 - Approved P.L.2017, c.76.