NJ S2098 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A3216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Substituted by A3216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain zero emission vehicle manufacturers to directly sell motor vehicles to consumers and requires them to operate service facilities.
Title
Permits certain zero emission vehicle manufacturers to directly sell motor vehicles to consumers and requires them to operate service facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Substituted by A3216 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3216 (Same As) 2015-03-18 - Approved P.L.2015, c.24.