NJ S2050 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Approved P.L.2020, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Excludes Armed Services combat zone pay from gross income taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Excludes Armed Services combat zone pay from gross income taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2481 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-28AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.93.
2020-09-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
2020-09-24AssemblySubstituted for A2481
2020-09-24AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-09-24SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-09-21SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-09-21SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-03-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2481 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2050/2090 (SCS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback