NJ S2044 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5073

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-05 - Approved P.L.2019, c.204.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "Deaf Student's Bill of Rights."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "Deaf Student's Bill of Rights."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1896 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-05AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.204.
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A1896 (2R)
2019-06-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-31SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-12-17SenateSenate Amendment (38-0) (Turner)
2018-12-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-06-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-26SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1896 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S2044 (2R)
A5073 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback