NJ S2042 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1641
Note: Carry Foward to future S121
Note: Carry Over of previous S1961
Note: Carry Over of previous A3009

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases reporting requirements for the NJ Basic Skills Training Program for Economic Growth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases reporting requirements for the NJ Basic Skills Training Program for Economic Growth.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-03SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2042 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S2042 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
S1961 (Carry Over) 2020-02-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A3009 (Carry Over) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A3240 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback