NJ S2024 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on December 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-05 - Approved P.L.2016, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that product approval from U.S. Food and Drug Administration is not required for drug manufacturer to file registration statement, and specifies timeframe by which DOH must review registration statements.
Title
Clarifies that product approval from U.S. Food and Drug Administration is not required for drug manufacturer to file registration statement, and specifies timeframe by which DOH must review registration statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3793 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-06 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.73. |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0) |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A3793 |
2016-10-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3793 (Same As) 2016-10-20 - Substituted by S2024