NJ S2008 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous S2350
Note: Carry Over of previous A1840

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Grow Your Own Teacher Loan Redemption Program in Higher Education Student Assistance Authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Grow Your Own Teacher Loan Redemption Program in Higher Education Student Assistance Authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-25SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2024-01-25SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2350 (Carry Over) 2022-06-02 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1840 (Carry Over) 2022-05-19 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A1619 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Labor Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback