NJ S2008 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2350
Note: Carry Over of previous A1840
Note: Carry Over of previous A1840
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Substituted by A3199 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Substituted by A3199 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Health Care Heroes Violence Prevention Act."
Title
Establishes "Health Care Heroes Violence Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Vincent Polistina [R] | Sen. Edward Durr [R] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Substituted by A3199 (3R) |
2022-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3199 (Same As) 2023-05-08 - Approved P.L.2023, c.48.
S2350 (Carry Over) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A4132 (2R)
A1840 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2350 (Carry Over) 2020-05-14 - Substituted by A4132 (2R)
A1840 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee