NJ S2 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Approved P.L.2010, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Approved P.L.2010, c.1.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various pension system changes concerning eligibility, retirement allowance formula, compensation definition, position eligible for service credit, non-forfeitable rights, prosecutors part, PFRS special retirement, employer contributions. *
Title
Makes various pension system changes concerning eligibility, retirement allowance formula, compensation definition, position eligible for service credit, non-forfeitable rights, prosecutors part, PFRS special retirement, employer contributions. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-22 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Approved P.L.2010, c.1. | |
2010-03-22 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-2) | |
2010-03-22 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2010-03-22 | Passed by the Assembly (62-5-9) | |
2010-03-22 | Emergency Resolution (DeCroce) (73-0-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeCroce) | |
2010-03-22 | Substituted for A2461 | |
2010-03-18 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-04 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Passed by the Senate (36-0) | |
2010-02-18 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2461 (Same As) 2010-03-22 - Substituted by S2