NJ S1974 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3612
Note: Carry Over of previous A2577
Note: Carry Over of previous A2577
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A2355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-29 - Substituted by A2355
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows State residents who are outside of New Jersey to place wagers on horse races using account wagering system.
Title
Allows State residents who are outside of New Jersey to place wagers on horse races using account wagering system.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-29 | Senate | Substituted by A2355 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2355 (Same As) 2020-11-06 - Approved P.L.2020, c.119.
S3612 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2577 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S3612 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2577 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee