NJ S1953 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2822

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs Dept. of Agriculture to authorize and advise food hubs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs Dept. of Agriculture to authorize and advise food hubs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-11-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2018-10-29SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-10-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2822 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Substituted by A3732 (2R)
A3592 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback