NJ S1948 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.253.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Employment and Training Provider Demonstration Project permanent and renames program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Employment and Training Provider Demonstration Project permanent and renames program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3647 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.253.
2019-06-27AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2019-06-27AssemblySubstituted for A3647 (1R)
2019-06-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-17AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Budget Committee
2019-05-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-09-24SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3647 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by S1948 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback