NJ S1923 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved P.L.2019, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises criteria for determining whether dog is vicious or potentially dangerous.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises criteria for determining whether dog is vicious or potentially dangerous.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1822 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.82.
2019-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0)
2019-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A1822 (1R)
2019-03-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
2018-09-27SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2018-07-26SenateSenate Amendment (24-0) (Singleton)
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1822 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1923 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback