NJ S1923 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-26 - Senate Amendment (24-0) (Singleton)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Revises criteria for determining whether dog is vicious or potentially dangerous.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises criteria for determining whether dog is vicious or potentially dangerous.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-26SenateSenate Amendment (24-0) (Singleton)
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1822 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback