NJ S1922 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3227
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A224 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-18 - Substituted by A224 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for licensing of pool and spa service contractors, and pool and spa builders and installers.
Title
Provides for licensing of pool and spa service contractors, and pool and spa builders and installers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Senate | Substituted by A224 (ACS/2R) |
2017-12-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3227 (Carry Over) 2015-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A224 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-15-1)
A224 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-15-1)