NJ S1870 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Approved P.L.2018, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Child Fatality and Near Fatality Review Board to study racial and ethnic disparities that contribute to infant mortality.
Title
Requires Child Fatality and Near Fatality Review Board to study racial and ethnic disparities that contribute to infant mortality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3653 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.22. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3653 |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (24-0) (Vitale) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3653 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S1870 (1R)