NJ S1869 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3395

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 29 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-7-2)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits sale of certain alarm business signs and decals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits sale of certain alarm business signs and decals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3554 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-29AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (68-7-2)
2018-10-29AssemblySubstituted for A3554 (1R)
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3395 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-3)
A3554 (Same As) 2018-10-29 - Substituted by S1869 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback