NJ S1862 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4074
Note: Carry Over of previous S2842
Note: Carry Over of previous S2842
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A2722 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A2722 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Commissioner of Corrections to institute 30-minute shift overlap in State correctional facilities.
Title
Requires Commissioner of Corrections to institute 30-minute shift overlap in State correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A2722 (1R) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Gopal) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2722 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
A4074 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2842 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4074 (Carry Over) 2018-06-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S2842 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee