NJ S1834 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1839

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each public institution of higher education to post its budget on the institution's website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires each public institution of higher education to post its budget on the institution's website.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2019-03-25SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1839 (Carry Over) 2016-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3680 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback