NJ S1830 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1311
Note: Carry Over of previous S1415
Note: Carry Over of previous A105

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends certain federal income tax advantages of individual health savings accounts to individual taxpayers under New Jersey gross income tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends certain federal income tax advantages of individual health savings accounts to individual taxpayers under New Jersey gross income tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-28SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1830 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A1125 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1415 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A105 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback