NJ S1830 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4177

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A542 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain schools to maintain supply of opioid antidotes and permits emergency administration of opioid antidote by school nurse or trained employee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain schools to maintain supply of opioid antidotes and permits emergency administration of opioid antidote by school nurse or trained employee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted by A542 (1R)
2018-06-14SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A542 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
A4177 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback