NJ S1827 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A1388
Note: Carry Foward to future S2006
Note: Carry Over of previous A4920
Note: Carry Over of previous S3112

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-15 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain providers to perform intimate partner violence screenings and all health care professionals to take certain actions to prevent perpetrator of intimate partner violence from obtaining copies of victim's medical record.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain providers to perform intimate partner violence screenings and all health care professionals to take certain actions to prevent perpetrator of intimate partner violence from obtaining copies of victim's medical record.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2022-02-28SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1827 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1827 (Carry Over) 2023-06-15 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1943 (Same As) 2023-06-15 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A4920 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S3112 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback