NJ S1808 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3192
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.194.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.194.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates striped bass as NJ State Saltwater Fish; redesignates brook trout as NJ Freshwater Fish.*
Title
Designates striped bass as NJ State Saltwater Fish; redesignates brook trout as NJ Freshwater Fish.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3342 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-07 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.194. |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Substituted for A3342 (1R) |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3342 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S1808 (1R)
S3192 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3192 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading