NJ S1805 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3727
Note: Carry Over of previous A4706
Note: Carry Over of previous A4706
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A2677 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A2677 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires New Jersey Historical Commission to establish Black Heritage Trail; permits New Jersey Black Cultural and Heritage Initiative Foundation to use funds for markers on certain trail sites; appropriates $1 million.
Title
Requires New Jersey Historical Commission to establish Black Heritage Trail; permits New Jersey Black Cultural and Heritage Initiative Foundation to use funds for markers on certain trail sites; appropriates $1 million.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | Senate | Substituted by A2677 (1R) |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Senate Amendment (Voice) (Cunningham) |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2677 (Same As) 2022-09-07 - Approved P.L.2022, c.102.
S3727 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (30-0) (Singleton)
A4706 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Singleton)
S3727 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (30-0) (Singleton)
A4706 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Senate Amendment (29-0) (Singleton)