NJ S1764 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S156
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Transportation Consolidation Task Force.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Transportation Consolidation Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S156 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee