NJ S1753 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3116

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns appointment of person to control funeral and disposition of human remains.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns appointment of person to control funeral and disposition of human remains.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1190 (Same As) 2019-05-13 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3116 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback