NJ S1745 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1999
Note: Carry Foward to future S2630
Note: Carry Over of previous S3730
Note: Carry Over of previous A5434
Note: Carry Foward to future S2630
Note: Carry Over of previous S3730
Note: Carry Over of previous A5434
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds 9-1-1 system regionalization costs to funds appropriated from "9-1-1 System and Emergency Response Trust Fund Account."
Title
Adds 9-1-1 system regionalization costs to funds appropriated from "9-1-1 System and Emergency Response Trust Fund Account."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1745 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1745 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A990 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3730 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5434 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S1745 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A990 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S3730 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A5434 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1745 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1745_I1.HTM |