NJ S1739 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-07 - Approved P.L.2017, c.192.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes sexual assault training requirements for law enforcement officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes sexual assault training requirements for law enforcement officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2167 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-07AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.192.
2017-06-22AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
2017-06-22AssemblySubstituted for A2167 (2R)
2017-06-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-06-22SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-06-19SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-06-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-06-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2167 (Same As) 2017-06-22 - Substituted by S1739 (1R)
A2605 (Carry Over) 2014-12-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback