NJ S1720 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1403
Note: Carry Over of previous S4030
Note: Carry Over of previous A3952
Note: Carry Over of previous S4030
Note: Carry Over of previous A3952
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires NJTA and SJTA to display amount of tolls paid in lanes used for electronic toll collection system, commonly known as E-ZPass.
Title
Requires NJTA and SJTA to display amount of tolls paid in lanes used for electronic toll collection system, commonly known as E-ZPass.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1720 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A564 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4030 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3952 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A564 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4030 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A3952 (Carry Over) 2018-05-10 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1720 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1720_I1.HTM |