NJ S1714 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S680
Note: Carry Over of previous A4724
Note: Carry Over of previous S3251
Note: Carry Over of previous A4724
Note: Carry Over of previous S3251
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits pre-approval or precertification of cancer treatments, tests, procedures and prescription drugs covered under health benefits or prescription drug benefits plans.
Title
Prohibits pre-approval or precertification of cancer treatments, tests, procedures and prescription drugs covered under health benefits or prescription drug benefits plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1714 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2022 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A4724 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Transferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S3251 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2022 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A4724 (Carry Over) 2019-01-17 - Transferred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S3251 (Carry Over) 2018-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1714 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1714_I1.HTM |