NJ S1712 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2959

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-09 - Approved P.L.2019, c.280.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires consumer notification of vehicle warranty for aftermarket and recycled parts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires consumer notification of vehicle warranty for aftermarket and recycled parts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5225 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-09AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.280.
2019-11-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2019-11-25AssemblySubstituted for A5225
2019-11-14AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-11-07AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-09-12SenatePassed by the Senate (31-0)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2959 (Carry Over) 2017-01-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5225 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - Substituted by S1712 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback