NJ S1709 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4197
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that certain beach owners and lessees have no duty to keep beach safe or to warn of hazards; provides immunity from liability, in certain cases, for injuries occurring on beach or in adjacent waters.
Title
Clarifies that certain beach owners and lessees have no duty to keep beach safe or to warn of hazards; provides immunity from liability, in certain cases, for injuries occurring on beach or in adjacent waters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4197 (Carry Over) 2023-12-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4394 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee
A4394 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment, Natural Resources, and Solid Waste Committee