NJ S1697 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1754
Note: Carry Foward to future S927
Note: Carry Foward to future S2083
Note: Carry Foward to future A3832
Note: Carry Over of previous A927
Note: Carry Over of previous S3455
Note: Carry Over of previous A4883
Note: Carry Foward to future S927
Note: Carry Foward to future S2083
Note: Carry Foward to future A3832
Note: Carry Over of previous A927
Note: Carry Over of previous S3455
Note: Carry Over of previous A4883
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain volunteer firefighters, rescue and first aid squad members to claim $2,000 gross income tax exemption.
Title
Allows certain volunteer firefighters, rescue and first aid squad members to claim $2,000 gross income tax exemption.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] |
Sen. Edward Durr [R] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-12-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-18 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-12-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1697 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1697 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1697 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1697 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A757 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A927 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S3455 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.344.
A4883 (Carry Over) 2020-10-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S1697 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1697 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1697 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A757 (Same As) 2023-12-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A927 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S3455 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.344.
A4883 (Carry Over) 2020-10-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee