NJ S1688 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2501

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires driver's manual to include driver's and law enforcement officer's responsibilities during police stop and under "move over" law; requires testing on responsibilities during police stop; and authorizes testing on duties under "move over" law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires driver's manual to include driver's and law enforcement officer's responsibilities during police stop and under "move over" law; requires testing on responsibilities during police stop; and authorizes testing on duties under "move over" law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3214 (Same As) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2501 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback