NJ S1687 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A759
Note: Carry Foward to future S175
Note: Carry Over of previous A713
Note: Carry Over of previous S1417
Note: Carry Foward to future S175
Note: Carry Over of previous A713
Note: Carry Over of previous S1417
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates the New Jersey Transfer Inheritance Tax and repeals parts of chapters 33 through 37 of Title 54 of the Revised Statutes.
Title
Eliminates the New Jersey Transfer Inheritance Tax and repeals parts of chapters 33 through 37 of Title 54 of the Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1687 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1687 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A931 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A713 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
S1417 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1687 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A931 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
A713 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
S1417 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1687 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1687_I1.HTM |