NJ S1681 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2240
Note: Carry Foward to future S2210
Note: Carry Over of previous A5348
Note: Carry Over of previous S3694
Note: Carry Over of previous S2780
Note: Carry Over of previous A304
Note: Carry Foward to future S2210
Note: Carry Over of previous A5348
Note: Carry Over of previous S3694
Note: Carry Over of previous S2780
Note: Carry Over of previous A304
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-13 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-13 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires racial and gender diversity in membership to be considered for appointments to certain boards and commissions established by statute.
Title
Requires racial and gender diversity in membership to be considered for appointments to certain boards and commissions established by statute.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-13 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1681 (Carry Over) 2022-06-13 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S1681 (Carry Over) 2022-06-13 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1466 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5348 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3694 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2780 (Carry Over) 2020-08-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A304 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S1681 (Carry Over) 2022-06-13 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1466 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A5348 (Carry Over) 2021-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3694 (Carry Over) 2021-04-26 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2780 (Carry Over) 2020-08-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A304 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee