NJ S1648 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1218
Note: Carry Over of previous A4240
Note: Carry Over of previous A4240
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1478 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1478 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Rivises law governing theater liquor licenses.*
Title
Rivises law governing theater liquor licenses.*
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Michael Doherty [R] |
Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-09 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-16 | Senate | Substituted by A1478 (2R) |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1648 (Carry Over) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by A1478 (2R)
A1478 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.466.
A4240 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (65-2-0)
A1478 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.466.
A4240 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (65-2-0)