NJ S1642 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2255

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires physicians and other prescribers to obtain informed consent from parents or guardians of minors for certain medications with "black box warnings."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires physicians and other prescribers to obtain informed consent from parents or guardians of minors for certain medications with "black box warnings."

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2255 (Carry Over) 2016-05-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4945 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback