NJ S1616 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3205
Note: Carry Over of previous A3128
Note: Carry Over of previous A3128
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides tuition benefits at public institutions of higher education to New Jersey residents who are members of reserve component of Armed Forces of United States.
Title
Provides tuition benefits at public institutions of higher education to New Jersey residents who are members of reserve component of Armed Forces of United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3205 (Carry Over) 2022-10-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3128 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3655 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3128 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3655 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee