NJ S1599 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1956
Note: Carry Over of previous A3548
Note: Carry Over of previous S3705
Note: Carry Over of previous A3548
Note: Carry Over of previous S3705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2186 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2186 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Statewide database of beds in shelters for the homeless.
Title
Establishes Statewide database of beds in shelters for the homeless.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A2186 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1599 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A2186 (1R)
A2186 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.440.
A3548 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3705 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2186 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.440.
A3548 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3705 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee