NJ S1599 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1729
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A3112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A3112
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes local units of government subject to "Local Public Contracts Law" and "Public School Contracts Law" to use electronic procurement technologies.
Title
Authorizes local units of government subject to "Local Public Contracts Law" and "Public School Contracts Law" to use electronic procurement technologies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-29 | Senate | Substituted by A3112 |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-13 | Senate | Transferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3112 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Approved P.L.2018, c.156.
S1729 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by A2220 (3R)
S1729 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by A2220 (3R)