NJ S1591 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2772

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires an annual State debt affordability analysis be included in the State Debt Report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires an annual State debt affordability analysis be included in the State Debt Report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2018-09-27SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2018-09-24SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S341 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - Withdrawn from Consideration
S2772 (Carry Over) 2016-11-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback