NJ S1586 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2425

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-29 - Substituted by A1100 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adds Monmouth County and Atlantic County as pilot counties for purposes of "Common Sense Shared Services Pilot Program Act." *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds Monmouth County and Atlantic County as pilot counties for purposes of "Common Sense Shared Services Pilot Program Act." *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-29SenateSubstituted by A1100 (2R)
2018-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1100 (Same As) 2018-11-27 - Approved P.L.2018, c.140.
S2425 (Carry Over) 2016-06-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback