NJ S1583 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5280

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies vacant shopping malls and office parks as eligible for designation as areas in need of redevelopment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies vacant shopping malls and office parks as eligible for designation as areas in need of redevelopment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-17 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1700 (Same As) 2018-09-13 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A5280 (Carry Over) 2017-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback