NJ S1578 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3140

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires State agencies to post Internet links to programs and services for women as applicable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires State agencies to post Internet links to programs and services for women as applicable.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2018-06-07SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-05-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3140 (Carry Over) 2017-05-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3384 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback