NJ S1569 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2739

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires boards of education to include instruction, and adopt instructional materials, that accurately portray political, economic, and social contributions of persons with disabilities and lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires boards of education to include instruction, and adopt instructional materials, that accurately portray political, economic, and social contributions of persons with disabilities and lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 10 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1335 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.6.
2018-12-17SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-5)
2018-12-17SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (52-10-15)
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted for A1335 (1R)
2018-12-06AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2018-06-25SenatePassed by the Senate (27-8)
2018-06-21SenateSenate Amendment (32-0) (Weinberg)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-18SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1335 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S1569 (2R)
A2739 (Carry Over) 2016-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback