NJ S1569 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-29 - Substituted by A906 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for equal opportunity for businesses that pay societal benefits charges to apply for certain energy-related incentives and funding.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for equal opportunity for businesses that pay societal benefits charges to apply for certain energy-related incentives and funding.*

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-29 Substituted by A906 (1R)
2011-06-23 Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2010-03-04 Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A906 (Same As) 2011-09-16 - Approved P.L.2011, c.126.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback