NJ S1565 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1540
Note: Carry Foward to future S888
Note: Carry Over of previous A2079
Note: Carry Over of previous S1100
Note: Carry Foward to future S888
Note: Carry Over of previous A2079
Note: Carry Over of previous S1100
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The "Municipal Volunteer Property Tax Reduction Act"; permits certain municipal property owners to perform volunteer services in return for property tax vouchers.
Title
The "Municipal Volunteer Property Tax Reduction Act"; permits certain municipal property owners to perform volunteer services in return for property tax vouchers.
Sponsors
Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1565 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1565 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1485 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2079 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1100 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1565 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1485 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2079 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1100 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1565 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1565_I1.HTM |